BERMONDSEY CENTRAL HALL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian worship and pastoral care; drop-in centre for elderly; provision of hostel accommodation to those in need of low-cost housing; food distribution programme; Saturday Supplementary School; housing & benefits advice; Youth activities (Boys and Girls Brigade; Summer Holiday Club); project to support young mothers in the community part funded (70%) by the Methodist Church VentureFX fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
Governance
- 13 May 2011: Standard registration
- BCH (Working name)
- SLM (Working name)
- SOUTH LONDON MISSION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ling Yu Ji | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ayodele Odumade | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abenaa Baffoe | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Akua Agyepong | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Reginald Abbey | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
KADIATU JALLOH RMHN | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
LOVETTE ABIOSEH KARGBO | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE JANE STEVENSON | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
HECTOR C SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRACEY VEDAWAIN MARLIN DIPMGT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VELMA FOFANAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL GEORGE SRN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £555.80k | £574.96k | £588.62k | £500.26k | £621.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £561.94k | £526.00k | £572.06k | £548.13k | £547.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £58.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £68.31k | £58.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £70.73k | £73.99k | £63.40k | £32.28k | £37.40k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.90k | £119.42k | £324 | £4.77k | £399.66k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £411.51k | £381.55k | £372.30k | £385.13k | £10.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £67.66k | £0 | £152.60k | £78.08k | £2.80k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £9.03k | £27.81k | £25.43k | £0 | £5.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £561.94k | £526.00k | £572.06k | £548.13k | £547.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £39.59k | £0 | £0 | £21.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.51k | £77.70k | £71.49k | £65.28k | £59.07k | |
|
Long-term investments | £58.93k | £52.66k | £64.68k | £57.23k | £56.45k | |
|
Other assets | £361.97k | £376.77k | £386.69k | £341.15k | £411.17k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.86k | £32.88k | £20.02k | £16.14k | £5.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 March 2022 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 March 2022 | 244 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 October 2020 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 October 2020 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
EXCEPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH LONDON MISSION
CENTRAL HALL
256 BERMONDSEY STREET
LONDON
SE1 3UJ
- Phone:
- 02074072014
- Email:
- contact@slmbermondsey.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window