Financial history MARLOW SPORTS CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1139862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £232.10k £137.76k £158.04k £174.10k £186.67k
Total expenditure £173.71k £124.31k £130.62k £127.24k £173.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.58k £21.10k £10.30k N/A N/A