NATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR GIVING VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's work involves teaching the public how song, and music as a whole, can either enhance or undermine the well-being both of individuals and the wider community. Music and song can be used in any situation, regardless of the person's state of health. Activities are largely based on Giving Voice (GV), an educational and self-directed tool developed by the NFGV's founder Jill Rakusen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 February 2011: Standard registration
- NFGV (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Healey | Chair | 19 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Edwards | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MAY THORPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL VALERIE RAKUSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAGGIE DAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | £1.63k | £1.76k | £1.75k | £2.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £13.68k | £20.58k | £3.69k | £9.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF MUSIC AND HEALTH AND WELLBEING
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Kirkhills
Thorner
LEEDS
LS14 3EX
- Phone:
- 01132893108
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window