LEWISHAM PENSIONERS' GAZETTE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lewisham Pensioners' Gazette Ltd., creates, prints and distributes a free quarterly newpaper for pensioners in the London Borough of Lewisham and neighbouring areas. We organise events to discuss pensioners' concerns and attend other events where these are also aired. All our trustees and volunteers are at or near retirement and we provide regular meetings and ongoing training for our members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lewisham
Governance
- 24 January 2011: Standard registration
- 30 April 2012: Funds received from 1074642 LEWISHAM PENSIONERS GAZETTE
- L-P-G.ORG.UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN BISHOP | Chair | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JOHN MITCHELL | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony Dobson | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3 | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £260 | £465 | £72 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 March 2021 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 AUGUST 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 2 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
(A) RELIEVING SUCH PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED; AND (B) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (PARTICULARLY IN THE SUBJECTS OF CREATIVE WRITING, GRAPHICS AND OTHER SKILLS RELATED TO NEWSPAPER PRODUCTION) AND FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PEOPLE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lewisham Pensioners' Gazette Ltd.
Stanstead Lodge
260 Stanstead Road
LONDON
SE23 1DD
- Phone:
- 02082911164
- Email:
- info@lpgazette.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window