THE WEATHER CLUB

Charity Number: 1137916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public on the subject of weather and climate, in order to raise awareness and understanding, and also to advance the protection of the environment and property, and the savings of lives; To promote further and higher education studies on the subject of weather and climate, and meteorology as a career;

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Sian Cave Chair 01 December 2014
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 September 2023 323 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
104 OXFORD ROAD
READING
RG1 7LL
Phone:
08456048136