FUTURES LEARNING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Three strategic priorities have been identified, which incorporate the objectives of the charity and these have been the focus of all activities in the period: 1. Global Citizenship, 2. Outdoor Learning, 3. Food and Nutrition
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Starkey | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Hall | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Coombs | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Spencer | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Ellis | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 20 AUGUST 2010 AND REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 5.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ANY SCHOOL OR AT ANY OTHER SCHOOL IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE CHARITY ACTS OR HAS ACTED AS A FOUNDATION; IT BEING ACKNOWLEDGED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THIS OBJECT THE CHARITY MUST (WHERE APPLICABLE) HAVE REGARD TO ITS OBLIGATION TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS; 5.2 TO ADVANCE AND ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, NATIONALITY, GENDER, SEXUALITY, DISABILITY OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS; 5.3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS AT ALL TIMES OF THE YEAR, INCLUDING BEFORE AND AFTER SCHOOL, WEEKENDS AND HOLIDAYS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; 5.4 TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO ASSIST IN ENABLING ACCESS TO EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE FACILITIES; AND 5.5 TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF ANY SCHOOL WHICH ARE NOT STATE FUNDED.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haslingden Primary School
Ryefield Avenue
Haslingden
Rossendale
BB4 4BJ
- Phone:
- 01706215947
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window