BRITANNIA ISLAMIC WELFARE TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Advance the Relgion of Islam in accordance to the doctrines of of the Sunni Hanafi Baralvi school of thought.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 30 December 2010: Standard registration
- 19 June 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- BIRMINGHAM ISLAMIC WELFARE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.51k | £9.39k | £22.72k | £10.00k | £2.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.24k | £11.96k | £27.97k | £8.51k | £3.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 DECEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2017 as amended on 10 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE TO THE DOCTRINES OF THE SUNNI HANAFI BRALVI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT, THE SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS AND GUIDANCE OF GULHAR SHARIF AND TO PROVIDE A POSITIVE FRAMEWORK FOR EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS IN THE BIRMINGHAM AREA AND ALYESBURY AREA MAY BE DISADVANTAGED DUE TO CULTURAL, RELIGIOUS OR FINANCIAL REASONS; TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN COMMUNITIES IN THE BIRMINGHAM AREA AND AYLESBURY AREA BY ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE OR RELIGION AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS GROUPS; AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window