Accounts and annual returns EVEN KEEL PROJECT

Charity Number: 1139917
Charity reporting is overdue by 1755 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 294 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 294 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 660 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 660 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1025 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1025 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1390 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1390 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1755 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1755 days