Financial history SACKS MORASHA JEWISH PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1137585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.01k £23.78k £20.58k £22.30k £22.94k
Total expenditure £12.10k £8.79k £38.60k £28.67k £38.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A