SUNNI MUSLIM KATCHI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES ARTS/CULTURE/HERITAGE/SCIENCE AMATEUR SPORT ECONOMIC/COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT/EMPLOYMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicester City
Governance
- 14 February 2011: Standard registration
- SUNNI MUSLIM JAMAT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AHMED YUSUF OSMAN | Trustee | 24 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Hanif Mussa Karbani | Trustee | 24 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Shamina Sumra | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
RUKSANA ZULFIKAR JAMAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL RAHMAAN SOTTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAISAL SAMEJA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HASHEEM ARAB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HANIFA TURK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ESSHAK SAMEJA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAZIR ELIAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZAFFER SUMRA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.90k | £11.31k | £14.21k | £9.96k | £19.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.56k | £3.86k | £5.52k | £2.35k | £1.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 April 2021 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LEICESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
LEICESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
115a Margaret Road
LEICESTER
LE5 5FW
- Phone:
- 07715491101
- Email:
- smka786@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window