CARRIERS OF HOPE COVENTRY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We assist asylum seekers,refugees and Romany migrants in Coventry via: 1.Weekly "Circle of Friends" meeting & distribution of clothes, food, baby equipment, toiletries, bedding, household furnishings & small amounts of cash 2.Weekly collections & deliveries of donated furniture 3.Celebrations & fun events to bring joy to otherwise joyless lives. 4.Home visits to identify needs & offer support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
Governance
- 24 February 2011: Standard registration
- 29 January 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 January 2019: Funds transferred to 1180105 CARRIERS OF HOPE, COVENTRY
- CIRCLE OF FRIENDS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.70k | £61.76k | £141.12k | £149.60k | £217.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.84k | £46.31k | £108.67k | £158.67k | £199.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.90k | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 30 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 13 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 13 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 07 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 07 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 22 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 22 November 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE PRIMARILY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND NEW MIGRANTS LIVING IN COVENTRY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window