SWINDON CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church ministry work within Swindon and surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keawe Chan | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
AUBREY CHOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ANDREW LEUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.05k | £58.49k | £63.91k | £73.20k | £130.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.68k | £57.75k | £47.21k | £66.93k | £76.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 June 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 June 2023 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHINESE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE. 2. TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHINESE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY BY MEANS OF EDUCATION OR OTHERWISE. 3. TO HOLD LAND AND BUILDINGS UPON TRUST TO PERMIT THEM TO BE USED: (A) AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY (B) AS A RESIDENCE FOR THE MINISTER OF THE CHINESE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT").
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 St. Philips Road
SWINDON
SN2 7QH
- Phone:
- 07768132108
- Email:
- contact@swindon-sccc.org.uk
- Website:
-
swindon-sccc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window