Financial history WIGAN & LEIGH CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1138908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £542.41k £501.18k £520.74k £518.59k £497.99k
Total expenditure £512.40k £473.75k £523.65k £652.38k £641.33k
Income from government contracts £430.00k £430.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £517.73k £506.51k £491.30k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.23k £2.05k £1.13k £6.86k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £5.79k £9.61k £1.88k £5.21k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £541.18k £489.46k £517.73k £506.51k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £223 £57 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £512.40k £473.75k £523.65k £652.38k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.94k £68.59k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A