TRINITY CHURCH GOSFORTH

Charity number: 1138362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public worship is held on Sundays. Festivals are marked by special additional services which have a community appeal. Trinity provides a wide range of weekday activities for the church and wider communities. Special services and activities are held for those with learning difficulties. Each year, a barbecue is held on 3 days, during which free food is offered to the wider community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £297,728
Total expenditure: £273,452

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • North Tyneside
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 October 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TRINITY CHURCH GOSFORTH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Lowry Trustee 29 September 2022
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Peter Short BA Trustee 29 September 2022
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Alexander David MABBS Chair Trustee 01 September 2022
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Susan Thomson Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
David John Cowans Trustee 18 March 2021
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rachel Louise Taglione Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Carole Lesley Eke JP BEd Trustee 01 September 2015
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ABBEYFIELD NORTHUMBRIA
Received: 1 day late
Alan George NICHOLSON Trustee 13 November 2014
TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH THE PRUDHOE STREET MISSION
Received: On time
Monica Eileen Goldfinch BSc Trustee 13 November 2014
None on record
CHARLES WILLIAM MACPHERSON FLEMING Trustee 01 September 2014
TYNE & WEAR HERITAGE FORUM
Received: On time
Dr ROSEMARY MENZIES MB ChB Trustee 31 October 2012
None on record
ROGER PICKARD BSc Trustee
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Keith Stewart Trustee
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
CHARLES JOHN PARKER MBE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £340.33k £249.31k £344.73k £258.15k £297.73k
Total expenditure £265.53k £255.18k £283.35k £281.90k £273.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 17 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 August 2022 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 August 2022 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 July 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 July 2020 28 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Trinity Church
High Street
Gosforth
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 4AG
Phone:
01912856130
Website:

trinitygosforth.org.uk