THURROCK MARCHING BRASS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thurrock Marching Brass provide affordable access for young people in the Thurrock and surrounding areas to the marching and performing arts where their social or economical background would otherwise likely prohibit involvement. We believe that every young person has the talent to achieve and will work tirelessly to provide an environment in which they can do just that.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Thurrock
Governance
- 11 November 2010: Standard registration
- 09 January 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 March 2019: Re-registered
- 09 January 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- TMB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.30k | £21.19k | £13.90k | £13.92k | £18.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.33k | £20.41k | £12.75k | £12.61k | £17.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 11 February 2020 | 256 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 26 March 2019 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 21 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
1. THE ORGANISATION SHALL BE KNOWN AS THE THURROCK MARCHING BRASS [HEREIN AFTER CALLED THE ORGANISATION]. 2. THE AIMS OF THE ORGANISATION ARE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF PERFORMING ARTS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITING TO THE BRITISH YOUTH BAND ASSOCIATION AS WELL AS ACTIVITIES SUPPORTING THE MARCHING BAND/DRUM CORPS STYLE OF PERFORMANCE (ALSO REFERRED TO AS A PERFORMING ARTS UNIT) AND IN PARTICULAR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE USE OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND COLOURGUARD EQUIPMENT, DANCE/INTERPRETATION TO MUSIC AND OTHER SUCH SKILLS AS WILL BE REQUIRED IN SUPPORT OF THE CHOSEN STYLE AND ACTIVITIES ASSOCIATED WITH.
Area of benefit
THURROCK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window