SEVERN VALLEY DONKEY AND DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of Donkeys and Dogs in need of care and attention and in particular to provide maintain rescue homes or other facilities for the reception, care and treatment of such animals. To help children and young people with disabilities and behavioural issues & members of the community who may benefit from animal therapy in particular Donkeys and Dogs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 09 November 2010: Standard registration
- DONKEY RESCUE UK (Previous name)
- SHROPSHIRE DONKEY RESCUE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELANIE STIRLING | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA LOUISE BALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.77k | £1.72k | £1.57k | £13.40k | £24.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.85k | £711 | £3.40k | £13.39k | £22.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 June 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DONKEYS AND DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND BEHAVIOURAL ISSUES, AS WELL AS MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO MAY BENEFIT FROM ANIMAL THERAPY IN PARTICULAR DONKEYS AND DOGS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRICKYARD COTTAGE
BILLINGSLEY
BRIDGNORTH
WV16 6PH
- Phone:
- 07968703541
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window