Financial history THE NATION CHURCH OF PEACE AND COMMUNION

Charity number: 1139164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.50k £22.68k £28.70k £172.30k £152.07k
Total expenditure £23.85k £22.35k £27.50k £164.30k £136.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.99k N/A