THE CHRISTIAN BLANDFORD FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Christian Blandford fund is to improve the comfort of children and their families, particularly those affected by cancer, during prolonged stays in NHS hospitals. We have worked mostly with St George's Hospital in Tooting but we have improved several other children's wards in the UK. We are now working closely with The Tesla Owners Group UK to provide mini electric cars for wards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER BLANDFORD BENG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
William Bartholomew Fealey | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Berrecloth | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAUDIA BLANDFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN BOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMY HANCOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.02k | £3.19k | £19.88k | £9.58k | £9.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.58k | £17.47k | £59.42k | £1.26k | £9.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND OTHER ITEMS AND FACILITIES AT CHILDREN'S WARDS IN HOSPITALS, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY. THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES TO IMPROVE THE COMFORT AND HEALTH OF BOTH CHILDREN ATTENDING THE HOSPITAL AND THEIR PARENTS/CARERS AND THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO PARENTS/CARERS IN FINANCIAL NEED WHO OTHERWISE ARE UNABLE TO ATTEND THE HOSPITAL TO THE DETRIMENT OF THE CHILD IN THEIR CARE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHAW WELL
GRACIOUS LANE END
SEVENOAKS
TN14 6HR
- Phone:
- 01732454317
- Email:
- PETER@CHRISTIANBLANDFORD.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window