Trustees WORLD MISSION SOCIETY CHURCH OF GOD
Charity number: 1141135

Charity reporting is up to date (93 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOO CHEOL KIM | Chair | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Michael Levy Adams | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
JONGWOO CHOI | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
TAEHYEONG JANG | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAEKWANG HEO | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL KING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.