CHESTER-LE-STREET METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Church work led by ministerial team. Lay members involved in running various groups. In 2010 a new structure covering 10 areas of church life were identified. Members encouraged to be involved to enable further development. Cornerstones has been open for eight years and many new activities and links with outside organisations made benefiting all ages in our community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £10,947 from 6 government grant(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Sunderland
Governance
- 09 September 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jennifer Margaret Pryde | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Neil Christopher Garlick | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Joan Moore | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
DOROTHY MARY CARR | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Derick Joseph Lawson | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Berry | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN WROE | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|||||||
Dorothy Jean Hedley | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MARION SMITH | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Freda Raine | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Margaret Johnson | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
FREDERICK HERBERT LOUIS JOHNSON | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Angela Heptinstalll | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
BRENDA WOOD B.ED HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROBERT GARDINER DOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARGARET LESLEY WALTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THOMAS ALAN SMITH B.ED | Trustee |
|
||||||||
BRIAN JONATHAN STRAUGHAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
THOMAS WILLIAM INDIAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.67k | £322.14k | £235.82k | £195.40k | £213.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £263.65k | £233.01k | £239.67k | £237.57k | £223.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.76k | £91.72k | £67.77k | £2.50k | £10.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chester le Street Methodist Church
North Burns
CHESTER LE STREET
DH3 3TF
- Phone:
- 01913881313
- Website:
-
clsmethodist.org.uk;cornerstonescentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window