THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND ST GABRIEL, STOKE GABRIEL, TOTNES.

Charity number: 1138315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary objective is delivering the mission of the Church to the parish and beyond in accordance with the doctrines and practices of the Church of England.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £121,505
Total expenditure: £121,511

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 October 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STOKE GABRIEL PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Clement Trustee 13 March 2024
None on record
Janice Nott Trustee 05 March 2024
SOUTH DEVON CHOIR
Recently registered
Rev Christopher Edward Martin Trustee 15 November 2023
None on record
John Mark Yallop CBE Trustee 15 March 2023
PHILLPOTTS AND BOYD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DEAN BOYD'S CHARITY FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
REYNOLDS WHALE TRUST FOR ORDINANDS
Received: On time
THE MARY MARRIOTT TRUST
Received: On time
BISHOP PHILPOTTS' AND DEAN BOYD'S CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUNDS
Received: On time
BOYD FOR EXHIBITIONS
Received: On time
THE CARYLL WENBORN TRUST FUND
Received: On time
DEAN AND CHAPTER OF EXETER CATHEDRAL SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
REVEREND CHANCELLOR HARINGTON FOR CHORISTERS OF EXETER CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
Gerald William Watson Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Roach Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Michael John Maplestone Brown Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
VALERIE PROCTOR Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
ELIZABETH MARGARET BALL Trustee 28 May 2013
None on record
IAN KEITH POTHAM Trustee 28 May 2013
STOKE GABRIEL VILLAGE HALL TRUSTEES
Received: On time
Evelyn Graham Watson Trustee
THE DEVON FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: On time
STOKE GABRIEL VILLAGE HALL TRUSTEES
Received: On time
THE DEVON FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: On time
ALAN PETER WILLIAM HILL Trustee
None on record
Michael John Stott Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £67.33k £106.86k £91.48k £110.84k £121.51k
Total expenditure £64.03k £90.54k £113.77k £121.28k £121.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 26 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 26 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hamewith
Duncannon Mead
Stoke Gabriel
Totnes
TQ9 6QZ
Phone:
01803782311
Website:

No information available