AFEMAI CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Afemai Children's Trust deliver cultural workshops to engage children and young people from all backgrounds. Their workshops develop understanding of different traditions and reduce isolation. Conveying diverse subjects, Afemai Children's Trusts' mission is to positively celebrate heritage and culture, and work with institutions that are keen to encourage a global outlook.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- Sheffield City
- Nigeria
Governance
- 10 November 2010: Standard registration
- A.C.T (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HASSAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amanesi James Ekpeh | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
SANGEETA DEO | Trustee | 14 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ADESEGUN TAIWO ONITIRI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £10.50k | £10.00k | £80.03k | £70.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.16k | £8.10k | £13.52k | £59.93k | £73.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF AFEMAI CHILDREN'S TRUST ARE TO PROVIDE AID, EDUCATION AND LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES TO CHILDREN STRUGGLING WITHIN THE AREA: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN LIVING IN NIGERIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO SCHOOLS AND THEIR PUPILS IN NIGERIA. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN AFRICAN ARTS AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NIGERIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 BEECH STREET
TINGLEY
WAKEFIELD
WF3 1RW
- Phone:
- 07887670345
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window