THE RIBAT INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity's activities include providing classes and lectures and social programmes. We have established a children's academic program and an adult education program in Surrey. In addition, we run a number of community activities including free meals to the homeless, a free gardening service for the elderly and running and maintaining a community allotment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hamid Masud | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wajid Sohail | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Muhammad Parwez Joghee | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.68k | £241.04k | £297.56k | £340.68k | £387.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.35k | £190.45k | £283.18k | £329.75k | £300.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.62k | £16.75k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND TRADITIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF HOLDING OF CLASSES, LECTURES, PRAYER, SOCIAL PROGRAMMES AND PRODUCING OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
73
Park Lane
CROYDON
CR0 1JG
- Phone:
- 07312072965
- Email:
- info@ribat.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window