VOLUNTARY ACTION SURREY EAST (VASE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary Action Surrey East Ltd (formerly Tandridge Voluntary Action) was incorporated on 13 July 2010 as a company limited by guarantee, company number 07313570 and registered charity number 1137664. It is governed by its Articles of Association. It was established to promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the community in the local government district of Tandridge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
108 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Standard registration
- 08 November 2012: Funds received from 1001186 TANDRIDGE VOLUNTARY SERVICE COUNCIL
- TANDRIDGE VOLUNTARY ACTION (Previous name)
- TANDRIDGE VOLUNTARY SERVICE COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Serena Jester | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Morris | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Adnyana | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Matthew | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Sumner | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ray Wilkinson | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Booth | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Graham David Jonathan Stone | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Thomas Alexander Sherlock | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne Forrest | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Victor Giles | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.82k | £145.97k | £160.43k | £149.76k | £77.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.89k | £179.75k | £152.94k | £125.86k | £55.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £85.10k | £104.95k | £54.78k | £75.03k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 2010. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 NOV 2017 as amended on 27 Sep 2018 as amended on 30 Sep 2021 as amended on 18 Jun 2024 as amended on 09 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICTS OF TANDRIDGE, REIGATE AND BANSTEAD, COLLECTIVELY KNOWN AS EAST SURREY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE ?AREA OF BENEFIT?). SPECIFICALLY, TO ENHANCE THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND EQUIP THEM WITH THE REQUISITE SUPPORT, INFORMATION, AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO ENGAGE IN OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE CAUSE.
Area of benefit
TANDRIDGE, REIGATE AND BANSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Community Hub
1st Floor Library Building
14 Gresham Road
Oxted
Surrey
RH8 0BQ
- Phone:
- 01883722593
- Email:
- info@vase.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window