CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH CANAANLAND MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Propagating the Gospel; Helping the Needy;Organising regular outreach programmes, fellowship, monthly and weekly prayer meetings and conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Greenwich
- Manchester City
- Southwark
- Nigeria
- South Africa
Governance
- 03 November 2010: Standard registration
- 28 June 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CAC CANAANLAND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.29k | £150.95k | £145.81k | £105.21k | £119.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.69k | £154.98k | £123.58k | £72.95k | £105.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 March 2023 | 30 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2021 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2021 | 236 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AND PROCLAIMING THE KINGDOM OF GOD THROUGH PREACHING THE WORD OF GOD, LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, PRAYER, AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF GOSPEL TRACTS B TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY PROVIDING CARE FOR THE NEEDY BY COOPERATION WITH OTHER CHARITABLE AND CHRISTIAN ORGAN
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window