Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL DISASTER FUND

Charity number: 1138533
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 14 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 14 August 2016 01 December 2017 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 14 August 2015 14 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2015 Not Required