Financial history INTERNATIONAL DISASTER FUND

Charity number: 1138533
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/08/2012 14/08/2013 14/08/2014 14/08/2015 14/08/2016
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0