THE ROTHSCHILD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1138145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The focus of our work has two distinct remits: as an operating charity, responsible for the care and management of Waddesdon Manor near Aylesbury, Buckinghamshire and undertaking a more general grants programme primarily in the Arts & Humanities. In addition, the foundation undertakes a small grants programme focused on Buckinghamshire and the communities local to Waddesdon.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 2010: Standard registration
  • 11 July 2012: Funds received from 290859 THE ALICE TRUST
  • 21 September 2012: Funds received from 202026 THE WADDESDON TRUST
  • 26 January 2024: Funds received from 1194781 BUCKINGHAMSHIRE FOOD PARTNERSHIP CIO
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE ALICE TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Anne Swallow Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
Christopher Mark Kemp Trustee 02 July 2021
None on record
Peter John Charles Troughton Trustee 27 November 2018
DEVIZES ASSIZE COURT TRUST
Received: On time
S.J.P. TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED Trustee 17 November 2015
ARTHUR GOODWIN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
THE HON EMILY MAGDA FREEMAN-ATTWOOD Trustee 20 November 2012
None on record
FRANCESCO GOEDHUIS Trustee 26 September 2012
None on record
THE HON HANNAH ROTHSCHILD Trustee 03 June 2011
ILLUMINATED RIVER FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £46.34m £37.68m £44.31m £41.36m £39.51m
Total expenditure £38.43m £35.18m £37.09m £42.30m £37.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £127.32k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.59m £8.00m £7.65m £255.47k £3.52m
Income - Other trading activities £22.20m £15.75m £20.84m £22.82m £14.41m
Income - Charitable activities £3.72m £2.62m £4.69m £4.83m £5.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.83m £11.32m £11.13m £13.45m £16.26m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.19m £15.98m £13.98m £16.81m £16.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.14m £2.99m £3.15m £3.72m £4.27m
Expenditure - Governance £44.00k £50.68k £58.38k £75.78k £54.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.33m £8.52m £9.07m £8.34m £6.92m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.51m £1.96m £2.06m £2.36m £2.39m
Expenditure - Other £20.10m £16.21m £19.96m £21.77m £15.95m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Own use assets £82.06m £86.24m £86.56m £90.41m £98.11m
Long-term investments £589.69m £673.54m £768.49m £690.61m £675.32m
Other assets £42.88m £30.69m £38.44m £42.90m £13.51m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £25.87m £26.08m £28.58m £26.45m £13.79m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 11 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 14 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 14 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WINDMILL HILL
SILK STREET
WADDESDON
AYLESBURY
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
HP18 0JZ
Phone:
01296653200