Financial history LYDGATE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1138157
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £69.80k £58.69k £63.43k £50.96k £47.21k
Total expenditure £57.93k £55.88k £46.39k £53.73k £52.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £49.90k £45.50k