SHAIKH ABDULQADIR JILANI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity formed to help the needy people suffered by calamity i.e. earthquake
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAFIQ-UR- REHMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mushhood Haider | Trustee | 14 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
GULAM RASUL HAIDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/08/2020 | 12/08/2021 | 12/08/2022 | 12/08/2023 | 12/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.90k | £890 | £10.83k | £4.21k | £4.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.90k | £1.00k | £10.00k | £4.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 August 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 August 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 August 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 August 2021 | 24 April 2023 | 316 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 August 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 284 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON AHL AS-SUNNAH WA'L-JAMA'AH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE TEACHINGS OF ISLAM AS TAUGHT BY SHAIKH ABDUL-QADIR JILANI: (HIS COMPLETE NAME: SHAIKH AL-SYED MUHIYUDIN ABU MUHAMMAD ABDAL QADIR AL-JAYLANI AL-HASANI WAL-HUSSAINI, SYED DENOTING HIS HONORIFIC TITLE OF DISCORDANCY FROM THE ISLAMIC PROPHET MUHAMMAD, MUHIYUDIN HIS TITLE FOR BEING KNOWN POPULARLY AS "THE REVIVER OF RELIGION", ABU MUHAMMAD HIS KUNYA (MEANING 'FATHER OF MUHAMMAD'), AL-JAYLANI DENOTING THE REGION HE HAILED FROM; ALSO WITH THE EPIPHET AL-BAGHDADI (DENOTING ALSO THE CITY OF BAGHDAD WHERE HE WAS BURIED), AND AL-HASANI WAL-HUSSAINI AFFIRMING HIS LINEAL DESCENT FROM BOTH SYED IMAM HASAN AND IMAM HUSSAIN, THE GRANDSONS OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD.) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AMONG THOSE IN NEED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR ORPHANS; AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Belmont Road
ILFORD
IG1 1YN
- Phone:
- 07891516299
- Email:
- S.A.Q.G.TRUST@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window