Financial history THE GARY BARTON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1138262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £995 £1.07k £330 £441 £70
Total expenditure £150 £390 £6.65k £546 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A