Financial history IPSWICH & SUFFOLK MUSLIM COUNCIL

Charity number: 1141759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £600 £2.00k £1.20k £5.24k £7.54k
Total expenditure £100 £50 £950 £500 £3.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A