SO THE CHILD MAY LIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To actively promote the health of children and young people by supporting initiatives which can alleviate sickness and suffering across Nepal and to support care and treatment for patients in Kanti Children's Hospital, Kathmandu, Nepal, by providing specialist equipment and through the facilitation of training and development of clinical staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Liverpool City
- Wirral
- Nepal
Governance
- 07 February 2011: Standard registration
- 06 March 2020: Funds received from 1123372 ALSG LIVERPOOL
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARMEL DERSCH | Chair |
|
||||||
Anne Christina Lang | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Owen Falder | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracie Cousineau | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deepak Raj Upadhyay MD MRCPCH | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER WILLIAM ARROWSMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr BARRY LEONARD PIZER MBCHB MRCP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ESTER ROSARIA MUFTI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER EVA PIZER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.47k | £30.88k | £18.16k | £21.26k | £9.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.09k | £39.71k | £14.30k | £33.27k | £2.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 FEBRUARY 2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 APR 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT AND THROUGH THE FACILITATION OF TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF CLINICAL STAFF AT THE KANTI CHILDREN’S HOSPITAL, KATHMANDU, NEPAL, IN ORDER TO PROVIDE BETTER CARE AND TREATMENT FOR THE PATIENTS; AND ALSO PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY SUPPORTING INITIATIVES WHICH CAN ALLEVIATE SICKNESS AND SUFFERING ACROSS NEPAL.
Area of benefit
NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 9
Bridgemere House
Mossley Hill Drive
Liverpool
L17 0ET
- Phone:
- 01512813064
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window