Accounts and annual returns INSAAN RELIEF

Charity number: 1139690
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2014 05 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 03 November 2014 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2013 26 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 25 February 2014 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2012 01 August 2013 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 29 August 2013 121 days late