WITHY TREES WELFARE & EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help the vulnerable locally and globally Support homeless Youth capacity building Relieve poverty locally and globally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 02 November 2010: Standard registration
- FULWOOD ISLAMIC NURSERY (Previous name)
- ROHINGYA RELIEF (Previous name)
- WITHY TREES CHILDCARE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Farook Kazi | Chair |
|
||||||
S HASAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
F PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.33k | £121.62k | £171.75k | £395.42k | £436.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £80.40k | £122.56k | £211.71k | £410.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.18k | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 February 2021 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 04/01/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN GENERALLY BELOW STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A NURSERY PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THOSE CHILDREN WHO FROM FAMILIES WHO MAY BE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WITHY TREES WELFARE & EDUCATION
157 GARSTANG ROAD
FULWOOD
PRESTON
PR2 3BH
- Phone:
- 01772715830
- Email:
- office@withytrees.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window