GLOBAL CHILDREN RELIEF (GCR)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Global Children Relief seeks to provide assistance to the street children to rehabilitate and to provide them with quality education or an apprenticeship in a trade. Where children are having to work to support family members, we would seek to recompense the family in the amount that the child would earn and to provide that child with an education or an apprenticeship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Luton
- Bangladesh
- India
- Pakistan
Governance
- 31 December 2010: Standard registration
- GCR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIGNESH KARUPPIAH | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hillsden Ian | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHAHEEN IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/08/2019 | 24/08/2020 | 24/08/2021 | 24/08/2022 | 24/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £30.00k | £45.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 August 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 August 2021 | 25 September 2023 | 458 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 August 2020 | 25 September 2023 | 823 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 August 2019 | 25 September 2023 | 1188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST CHILDREN IN PAKISTAN, INDIA, BANGLADESH, SRI LANKA, BHUTAN, NEPAL, MALDIVES AND AFGHANISTAN WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF THEM BEING ORPHANED DESTITUTE OR HOMELESS BY THE PROVISION OF AN ORPHANAGE IN PAKISTAN, INDIA, BANGLADESH, SRI LANKA, BHUTAN, NEPAL, MALDIVES AND AFGHANISTAN FOR SUCH CHILDREN; AND 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE ORPHANED CHILDREN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHILD'S CULTURE, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT WHEN THE CHILD ENTERS ADULTHOOD.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN, INDIA, BANGLADESH, SRI LANKA, BHUTAN, NEPAL, MALDIVES AND AFGHANISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Titan Court
Laporte Way
LUTON
LU4 8EF
- Phone:
- 01582451745
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window