BARRY LADIES' CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Ladies' Choir based in Barry, South Wales. Our aim is to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of music, in particular choral music, through public concerts and recitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 14 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Anne Green | Chair | 22 March 2016 |
|
|||||
JULIA HOPKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.89k | £4.28k | £11.67k | £3.90k | £5.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.63k | £2.76k | £3.24k | £5.46k | £5.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2023 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ADOPTED 01/03/2004 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2011
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE E OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, BUT IN PARTICULAR CHORAL MUSIC, BY ANY REASONABLE MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT AND TAKING INTO ACCOUNT THE EXPERTISE OF THE MUSICAL DIRECTOR, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; AND 2 TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Maes Glas
BARRY
CF62 6LP
- Phone:
- 01446732571
- Email:
- barryladieschoir@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window