OAK TREE FARM RURAL PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oak Tree Farm provides training and supported occupation for adults with learning disabilities in a rural environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 13 October 2010: Standard registration
- OAK TREE FARM RURAL PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Anderson | Chair | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Stacey Holmes | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Pattinson-Evans | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin Cambell | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Thomas | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Blurton | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Penfold | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LESLIE FOLKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Simon Lee Mountford | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE ELIZABETH BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £591.53k | £225.44k | £217.19k | £391.36k | £443.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £369.50k | £303.91k | £268.98k | £345.45k | £401.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | £5.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £263.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £146.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £179.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £240.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £306.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £62.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND DIFFICULTIES THROUGH ACTIVITIES AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN HORTICULTURE, AGRICULTURE, CATERING, POTTERY AND ASSOCIATED RURAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAK TREE FARM
SANDON ROAD
HILDERSTONE
STONE
ST15 8RT
- Phone:
- 01889505653
- Email:
- admin@oaktreefarm.uk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window