AERO-MEDICAL REPATRIATION CHARITY (ARC)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's main purpose is the relief of sickness, through the repatriation of that person to the UK, to uninsured individuals who find themselves stranded abroad and have no way of returning home. The charity will provide advice, support & services not normally provided by the statutory authorities and ancillary to those provided by the doctors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 May 2011: Standard registration
- 17 September 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 17 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1098874 THE AIR AMBULANCE SERVICE
- ARC (Working name)
- MEDIAVIATION AERO-MEDICAL REPATRIATION CHARITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08k | £76 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £329 | £1.36k | £13 | £13 | £13 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AID AND ASSISTANCE FOR PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, WHO FIND THEMSELVES STRANDED FOR MEDICAL REASONS AND HAVE NO WAY OF RETURNING HOME, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DUE TO LACK OF MEANS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE PURPOSES THAT CHARITY WILL ALSO PROVIDE ADVICE, SUPPORT AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY MEDICAL STAFF.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window