REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD-THE SHEPHERD'S HOUSE MANCHESTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MARRIAGE AND COUNSELLING SEMINARS. CHILDREN PLAY GROUPS MUSIC AND INSTRUMENT LEARNING FOR TEENAGERS ASSISTING HOMELESS AND DRUG ADDICTED INDIVIDUALS MORAL INSTRUCTIONAL TEACHINGS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 19 January 2011: Standard registration
- 09 March 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- RCCG SHEPHERDS HOUSE MANCHESTER (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.20k | £18.21k | £18.62k | £8.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.65k | £168.10k | £18.20k | £8.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 13 January 2016 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 05 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JUN 2010
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window