THE SICKLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE SICKLE FOUNDATION IS DEDICATED TO SUPPORTING THE ENJOYMENT, APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC AND THE ARTS. WE SEEK TO HELP YOUNG MUSICIANS ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL TOWARDS SECURING CAREERS AS PERFORMERS E.G. THE FOUNDATION SUPPORTS THE COST OF STUDIES AND/OR MAINTENANCE OF OUTSTANDING POSTGRADUATE OR POST-DIPLOMA STUDENTS. THIS IS DONE THROUGH SCHOLARSHIPS AND AWARDS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HARDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Edward Richard Harden | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MATILDA CLARE HARDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BETTINA CLARE LASCELLES HARDEN MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £610 | £566 | £727 | £509 | £11 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.53k | £21.50k | £15.35k | £12.41k | £11.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 09 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, HERITAGE AND MUSIC AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CREATION AND ENJOYMENT, APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THESE THROUGH PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS; 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF BRITISH OR BRITISH COMMONWEALTH NATIONALITY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY: I) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION BASED ON ABILITY AND INDIVIDUAL NEED; II) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS, TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION, OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; III) ASSISTING ANY CHARITY WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS, BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL,PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH MUSICAL ACTIVITIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NANHORON
PWLLHELI
GWYNEDD
LL53 8DL
- Phone:
- 01758730610
- Email:
- bettina.harden@nanhoron.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window