Accounts and annual returns CHARITY FOR EMMANUEL COLLEGE LIBRARY

Charity number: 1143802
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2015 29 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 30 August 2016 31 days late
Annual return 30 September 2014 07 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 07 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2013 01 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 01 July 2014 On Time