FOUR PAWS CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering of animals in need of care and attention and in particular to provide and maintain rescue homes or other facilities for the reception, care and treatment of such animals in the Oxfordshire area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Ruth Innes | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
TERESA JANE BROWN | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.87k | £35.13k | £31.08k | £36.16k | £26.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.99k | £48.53k | £33.83k | £39.68k | £23.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS WITHIN THE OXFORDSHIRE AREA
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 WHEATLEY ROAD
FOREST HILL
OXFORD
OX33 1EH
- Phone:
- 01865872967
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window