THE SOUTH AFRICAN SCHOOLS' PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The South African Schools' Project aims to help relieve poverty by supporting schools and other organisations which serve some of South Africa's poorest communities, by providing essential educational resources, sports equipment and training. The charity is also involved with school feeding schemes and offers bursaries to the most needy children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Africa
Governance
- 26 October 2010: Standard registration
- 11 January 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1105747 SOS AFRICA
- SASP (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.79k | £106.88k | £70.35k | £48.18k | £8.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.29k | £53.92k | £58.90k | £28.73k | £46.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SOUTH AFRICA, PRIMARILY THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF DISADVANTAGED SCHOOLS
Area of benefit
SOUTH AFRICA,
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window