OASES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to support education and poverty relief in Kawangware and Riruta, Nairobi, Kenya. Key projects: Oases Social Work, secondary school support and Special Needs Support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Kenya
Governance
- 28 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH MBAABU | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN WYATT | Trustee | 13 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN JANET NEAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.89k | £7.82k | £9.55k | £6.64k | £6.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.52k | £6.17k | £6.14k | £6.86k | £6.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN RIRUTA AND KAWANGWARE (KENYA) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT, INCLUDING BY: I) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTE OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION II) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INC. STUDY OF MUSIC OR ART), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION, OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN KENYA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Hallcroft Court
Croft Avenue
Hucknall
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 7JD
- Phone:
- 07980038378
- Email:
- JUDITHMBAABU@YMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window