CITY LIFE LONDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity's main purpose is the advancement of the Christian faith. During the year, this was mainly achieved through a regular public worship service where the Christian faith is explained through applying the Biblical text in the context of life in London, pastorally caring for individuals who attend our services and developing small group meetings where community is formed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 29 October 2010: Standard registration
- 17 June 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1163077 GRACE CHURCH GREENWICH
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1167535 REALITY CHURCH LONDON
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1163077 GRACE CHURCH GREENWICH
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1167535 REALITY CHURCH LONDON
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1163077 GRACE CHURCH GREENWICH
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1167535 REALITY CHURCH LONDON
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1161147 GRACE LONDON
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1164249 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1131846 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL ...
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1154174 GRACE CHURCH BROCKLEY
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1111950 Christ Church London
- Canada Water Church (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.65k | £181.67k | £193.41k | £161.73k | £144.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.56k | £138.99k | £157.41k | £144.69k | £159.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2010 as amended on 15 Oct 2021 as amended on 26 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
The Charity’s objects (“Objects”) are for the public benefit, specifically: (a) to advance the Christian religion in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs appearing in the Schedule hereto applicable to the congregation in London and in other parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Trustees from time to time think fit and to fulfil such other purposes consistent with the Statement of Beliefs which are exclusively charitable according to the law of England and Wales and are connected with the charitable work of the Trust. (b) to relieve persons who are in conditions of need or hardship or who are aged or sick and to relieve the distress caused thereby in the said location and in such other parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the trustees may from time to time think fit.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window