DEAF UNITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Continues its work to support deaf students, graduates and professionals. We successfully launched the Deaf Learners Project which provides training, workshops, conferences, information, networking and a peer support. We continue to help all deaf learners achieve their full potential. We utilise technology to build our membership through social networking sites and other online activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 May 2011: Standard registration
- 04 June 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.25k | £9.21k | £806 | £490 | £2.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.40k | £5.43k | £3.62k | £200 | £3.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 23 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 16 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 15 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/04/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE DEVELOPMENT OF COMMUNITIES OF DEAF AND HARD-OF-HEARING INDIVIDUALS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THEIR MEMBERS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY, AND TO EXTEND AND STRENGTHEN LINKS BETWEEN THOSE COMMUNITIES. (2) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG DEAF AND HARD-OF-HEARING INDIVIDUALS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING DEAF OR HARD-OFHEARING BY: (A) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE DEAF AND HARD-OF-HEARING INDIVIDUALS TO LEARN, UNDERSTAND AND USE SIGN LANGUAGE; (B) PROVIDING ACCESS TO EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES, INCLUDING SCHOOLING, IN SIGN LANGUAGE; (C) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING DEAF AND HARD-OF-HEARING INDIVIDUALS, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION; (D) PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT; AND (E) PROVIDING SIGN LANGUAGE TRANSLATORS SO THAT DEAF AND HARDOF- HEARING INDIVIDUALS MAY ACCESS HEALTH CARE IN SIGN LANGUAGE. (3) THE PROMOTION OF DEAF ART, HERITAGE, AND CULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS SET OUT BY THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF DISABLED PEOPLE AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS. (4) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) ELIMINATING DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF DEAFNESS AND HEARING LOSS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AS IT RELATES TO DEAF AND HARD-OF-HEARING INDIVIDUALS; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN HEARING PEOPLE AND DEAF AND HARD-OF-HEARING INDIVIDUALS; (D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AS THEY RELATE TO DEAFNESS AND HEARING LOSS AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; AND (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AS THEY RELATE TO DEAFNESS AND HEARING LOSS. (5) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DEAF PEOPLE BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, TRAINING, ADVICE AND EXPERT SERVICES.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window