BHAI MARDANA GURMAT MISSIONARY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dudley
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 02 February 2011: Standard registration
- 19 April 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE RELIGION THROUGH THE TEACHINGS OF THE GURU GRANTH SAHIB AND TO PROVIDE A PLACE OF WORSHIP ACCORDING TO THE TEACHINGS OF THE SIKH RELIGION. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WEST MIDLANDS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, RELIGION, CULTURE, AGE OR GENDER, BY THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE CLASSES PROMOTING THE PUNJABI LANGUAGE, TEACHING BOTH PUNJABI AND ENGLISH TO MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY. 3. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF: (A) IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE (B) PROMOTING COMMUNITY COHESION AND PARTICIPATION.
Area of benefit
THE WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window