Trustees BREAST CANCER UK LIMITED
Charity number: 1138866

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christopher Twelves | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Price | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Silvy Mardiguian | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nazia Tingay | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lotte Spencer | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beezy Marsh | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clelia Froguel | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margot Black | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jarvis | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Freeborough | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.