THE BLUE SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity organises several fundraising events throughout the school year to bring together the whole school community and to raise funds to enrich the children's school education and experience .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Hounslow
Governance
- 13 October 2010: Standard registration
- ISLEWORTH BLUE SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Sankey | Chair | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hesed | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mulford | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Appannah | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharleen Tsuchihashi | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.10k | £18.64k | £18.66k | £32.82k | £28.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.89k | £31.96k | £6.34k | £21.28k | £23.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 March 2021 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 March 2021 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BLUE C OF E SCHOOL
NORTH STREET
ISLEWORTH
TW7 6RQ
- Phone:
- 02085606721
- Email:
- blueschool.pa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window